08/09/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/27/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/27/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/22/2023 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/16/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
03/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |