09/11/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/29/2023 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
06/28/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/22/2023 | Re-Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
06/15/2023 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |||
06/09/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
04/06/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
04/05/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/14/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |