08/03/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 85 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 85 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/28/2023 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
03/28/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 4 NO 1 NOT VOTING | |||
03/28/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 85 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/28/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 85 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |