06/21/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/20/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 89 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/26/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
04/26/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |||
04/04/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
04/04/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
03/30/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 Favorable | |||
03/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
03/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
03/17/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |