02/28/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
01/23/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/28/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/28/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 91 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/28/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 91 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
04/25/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |||
04/25/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 1 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
04/25/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 91 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
04/04/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable | |||
03/24/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |