LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB98
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB98
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB98
Action History
07/21/2023
Signed by Governor
06/27/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
06/22/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
06/21/2023
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
06/21/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
06/01/2023
Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 98, and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House