08/03/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/27/2023 | Roll Call Rescinded in Senate | |||
06/27/2023 | Reconsidered in Senate | |||
06/27/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 5 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2023 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
06/06/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 13 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 99 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 25 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 99 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 99 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/06/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 99 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/02/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 8 Favorable | |||
04/27/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |