LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR15
DE
Delaware House Bill HCR15
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR15
Introduced
3/14/23
Introduced
3/14/23
Engrossed
3/14/23
Caption
Designating March 14, 2023 As "equal Pay Day" In The State Of Delaware.
Latest HCR15 Activity
Companion Bills
No companion bills found.
Previously Filed As
DE HCR24
Recognizing April 25, 2023, As "delaware Teach Children To Save Day".
DE HCR49
Recognizing May 20, 2023, As "armed Forces Day".
DE HCR100
Recognizing May 10th As Major George S. Welch Day.
DE HCR73
Recognizing June 25th-july 1st, 2023 As "deafblind Awareness Week
DE HCR128
Recognizing May 6-10, 2024, As "teacher Appreciation Week" In The State Of Delaware.
DE HCR44
Recognizing May 8-12, 2023 As "teacher Appreciation Week".
DE HCR163
Honoring The Marine Corps 249th Birthday On November 10, 2024.
DE HCR53
Recognizing May 2023 As "foster Care Month" In The State Of Delaware.
Similar Bills
No similar bills found.