03/29/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
03/16/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 8 On Its Merits | |||
03/09/2023 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
03/09/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/09/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HJR 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/07/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HJR 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/25/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |