07/25/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/14/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
06/13/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT | |||
06/13/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/01/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/18/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
05/02/2023 | Not Enough Signatures to Release | |||
04/06/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
04/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
03/29/2023 | Assigned to Housing Committee in House | |||
03/23/2023 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 1 |