07/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 12 NO | |||
06/27/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/06/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 7 Favorable | |||
05/18/2023 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |||
05/17/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 4 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/16/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
05/12/2023 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 102 |