LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB105
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB105
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB105
Action History
06/29/2023
Signed by Governor
06/15/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/13/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
06/08/2023
Assigned to Administration Committee in House
06/08/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
06/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
05/03/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate