LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB107
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB107
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB107
Action History
09/21/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
06/20/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 6 On Its Merits
06/14/2023
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
06/13/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/12/2023
was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 107