08/31/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/23/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 108 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 108 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/14/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |||
05/04/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate |