LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB109
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB109
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB109
Action History
08/24/2023
Signed by Governor
06/27/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
05/17/2023
Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
05/16/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/10/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
05/04/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate