LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB11
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB11
Action History
06/30/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 32 YES 8 NO 1 NOT VOTING
06/20/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
05/23/2024
Assigned to Administration Committee in House
05/22/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
05/21/2024
was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 11