07/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 28 YES 11 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 110 - Defeated By House. Votes: 16 YES 23 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/02/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 110 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/01/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
05/18/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
05/05/2023 | Re-Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
05/04/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |