06/28/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/21/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Assigned to Housing Committee in House | |||
06/06/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
05/12/2023 | Re-Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
05/10/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |