LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB121
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB121
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB121
Action History
03/07/2024
Signed by Governor
01/11/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
06/07/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
06/06/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/17/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 Favorable
05/11/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate