LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB124
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB124
Action History
07/31/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
06/07/2023
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
06/06/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
05/17/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 Favorable
05/11/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate