LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB126
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB126
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB126
Action History
06/30/2023
Signed by Governor
06/22/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/13/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
06/08/2023
Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House
06/07/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 ABSENT
05/17/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
05/11/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate