10/01/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/30/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/23/2024 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 13 |