LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB135
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB135
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB135
Action History
06/30/2023
Signed by Governor
06/22/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/20/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
06/14/2023
Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
06/13/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
05/19/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate