09/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 24 YES 16 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |||
06/23/2023 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
06/16/2023 | Re-Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
05/19/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |