07/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/22/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/15/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/14/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/14/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 149 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
06/07/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 149 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |