08/01/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/13/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |||
05/23/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
05/22/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/22/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/21/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/14/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 150, and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |