08/09/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
06/15/2023 | Re-Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/14/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/13/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
06/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |