08/17/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 ABSENT | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 5 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/16/2023 | Re-Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/16/2023 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 165 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 165 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 165 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
06/14/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 165 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/06/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |