01/24/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/22/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/16/2023 | Assigned to Housing Committee in House | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 172 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 172 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
06/14/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/09/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate |