09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/16/2024 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
05/15/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/18/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
03/14/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
02/29/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 174, and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |