07/17/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/16/2023 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 Favorable | |||
06/14/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/13/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |