LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB176
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB176
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB176
Action History
08/10/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
06/28/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 12 On Its Merits
06/23/2023
Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
06/22/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
06/21/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
06/13/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate