08/29/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/06/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 1 Favorable, 13 On Its Merits | |||
01/24/2024 | Not Worked in Committee | |||
01/10/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |||
01/09/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
06/16/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |