09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/26/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |||
06/25/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
01/17/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
01/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
06/28/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |