09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 8 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
02/29/2024 | Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House | |||
01/25/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
01/25/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 197 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
01/25/2024 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
01/25/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 197 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/18/2024 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
01/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |||
09/13/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |