LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB199
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB199
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB199
Action History
09/26/2024
Signed by Governor
06/25/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
03/05/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 7 Favorable
01/24/2024
Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
01/23/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
01/17/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
01/04/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate