06/25/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/21/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
03/06/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |||
03/05/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
01/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 8 Favorable | |||
01/18/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
01/18/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |