06/20/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/21/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/16/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
05/16/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 200 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
04/24/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/19/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/13/2024 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
03/12/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 200 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/11/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
01/04/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |