09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
06/25/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 202 - Defeated By House. Votes: 13 YES 24 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
06/25/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Defeated By House. Votes: 18 YES 19 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |||
04/23/2024 | Not Worked in Committee | |||
03/14/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 202 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/24/2024 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |||
01/23/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
01/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |||
01/04/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |