09/26/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/21/2024 | Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |||
05/16/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/16/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 206 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
05/15/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 206 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/17/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate |