LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB209
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB209
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB209
Action History
06/20/2024
Signed by Governor
05/23/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
04/24/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
03/21/2024
Assigned to Administration Committee in House
03/20/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
03/13/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
01/18/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate