08/01/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |||
06/12/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 215 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 215 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
03/27/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
03/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/26/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SB 215 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/26/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 215 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
02/26/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |