08/01/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits | |||
04/23/2024 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |||
04/18/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
04/18/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |||
03/26/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 216 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
02/26/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |