LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB22
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB22
Action History
08/09/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
05/14/2024
Assigned to Housing Committee in House
05/09/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING
04/24/2024
was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 22