09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/25/2024 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
04/24/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
04/24/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
04/24/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in Senate | |||
04/23/2024 | Amendment SA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
04/16/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/11/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 221, and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |