LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB232
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB232
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB232
Action History
08/29/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
05/14/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
03/20/2024
Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
03/19/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
03/13/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable
03/06/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate