09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 13 NO 3 ABSENT | |||
05/07/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
04/18/2024 | Assigned to Labor Committee in House | |||
04/17/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |||
04/17/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 233 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
04/17/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 233 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/06/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate |