LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB234
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB234
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB234
Action History
07/17/2024
Signed by Governor
06/25/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 9 On Its Merits
03/27/2024
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
03/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
03/20/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
03/06/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate