LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB235
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB235
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB235
Action History
06/30/2024
Signed by Governor
06/18/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
04/16/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
03/26/2024
Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
03/21/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
03/13/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
03/06/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate