LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB237
Action History
DE
Delaware Senate Bill SB237
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware Senate Bill SB237
Action History
09/05/2024
Signed by Governor
06/27/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
05/22/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
04/24/2024
Assigned to Housing Committee in House
04/23/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 ABSENT
03/27/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/12/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate